Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 253 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 1479 Week
» 21124 Month
» 55766 Year
» 1277331 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3272
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 5390   31/12/1936
O4 6338   25/11/1939
O4 6213   21/02/1942
O4 6529   27/05/1944
O4 3719   06/12/1947