Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3638 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17044 Week
» 70060 Month
» 189587 Year
» 3216440 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #1399
Pre Grouping Company |
GCR |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
15 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
O4 |
6345 |
|
27/10/1928 |
O4 |
6199 |
|
28/01/1933 |
O4 |
5377 |
|
20/06/1936 |
O4 |
6604 |
|
14/10/1938 |
O4 |
6205 |
|
07/1940 |
|