Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 328 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7335 Week
» 13469 Month
» 241353 Year
» 1462918 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3225
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6203   20/12/1935
O4 6624   06/08/1938
O4 6293   11/01/1941
O4 5415   06/03/1943
O4 6215   28/07/1945
O4 3722   07/04/1947
O4 63724   04/06/1949