Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 736 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 6545 Week
» 13729 Month
» 321710 Year
» 1206091 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1469
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1203   08/1912
O4 1204   30/06/1917
O4 1201   11/07/1922
O4 6259   14/05/1929
O4 6238   14/03/1931