Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 308 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7315 Week
» 13449 Month
» 241333 Year
» 1462898 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #858
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 2063   07/1919
O4 6500   12/11/1932
O4 6565   12/01/1935
O4 6201   10/07/1937
O4 6228   20/01/1940
O4 5005   18/04/1942
O4 5022   29/07/1944