Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1288 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7677 Week
» 28119 Month
» 364965 Year
» 1586530 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3242
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6524   06/06/1936
O4 6202   09/07/1938
O4 6588   23/03/1940
O4 6498   23/11/1940
O4 6505   08/05/1943
O4 6331   26/05/1945
O4 3679   25/10/1947