Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 587 Today
» 1287 Yesterday
» 1874 Week
» 31460 Month
» 405473 Year
» 1627038 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1318
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1849   02/1918
O4 6630   08/02/1932
O4 6313   14/04/1934
O4 6545   02/05/1936
O4 6203   23/07/1938
O4 6294   22/03/1941
O4 6542   10/07/1943