Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 148 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 1223 Week
» 22125 Month
» 22125 Year
» 1243690 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3221
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6324   16/11/1935
O4 6554   28/05/1938
O4 6561   07/12/1940
O4 6203   03/07/1943
O4 6226   04/08/1945