Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 127 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 5936 Week
» 13120 Month
» 321101 Year
» 1205482 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1943
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1205   19/06/1922
O4 6293   11/06/1929
O4 6622   04/06/1931
O4 6567   08/08/1936
O4 6342   21/01/1939
O4 5394   29/03/1941
O4 6313   15/05/1943