Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 784 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 4383 Week
» 10517 Month
» 238401 Year
» 1459966 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1303
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1691   01/1919
O4 6274   30/08/1924
O4 6206   06/12/1930
O4 6269   28/10/1933
O4 6595   30/11/1935