Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 524 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1623 Week
» 7757 Month
» 235641 Year
» 1457206 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1308
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1840   12/1917
O4 6318   22/07/1933
O4 5418   30/01/1936
O4 6206   26/03/1938
O4 6254   30/11/1940