Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 585 Today
» 1287 Yesterday
» 1872 Week
» 31458 Month
» 405471 Year
» 1627036 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1256
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6332   02/03/1935
O4 6567   07/01/1939
O4 6495   15/03/1941
O4 6262   21/08/1943
O4 6206   20/01/1945
O4 3821   04/10/1947
O4 63895   18/02/1950