Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 312 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7319 Week
» 13453 Month
» 241337 Year
» 1462902 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1745
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1207   15/06/1918
O4 399   12/05/1923
O4 5390   08/06/1926
O4 6540   11/1930
O4 6300   26/08/1933
O4 6540   09/1935