Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3969 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17375 Week
» 70391 Month
» 189918 Year
» 3216771 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #9194/21157
Pre Grouping Company |
GNR |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
3 |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
K2 |
4670 |
|
26/08/1939 |
K2 |
4641 |
|
11/08/1944 |
K2 |
4674 |
LOCH ARKAIG |
18/05/1946 |
K2 |
61789 |
LOCH LAIDON |
29/12/1950 |
K2 |
61784 |
|
12/11/1955 |
|