Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 178 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1212 Week
» 23718 Month
» 326908 Year
» 1548473 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #621
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6207   18/06/1932
O4 6242   17/10/1936
O4 6232   26/09/1942
O4 6207   28/07/1945