Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 328 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7335 Week
» 13469 Month
» 241353 Year
» 1462918 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #828
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6208   04/02/1928
O4 6629   07/07/1932
O4 6293   13/06/1935
O4 6288   07/11/1936
O4 6527   11/11/1939
O4 6264   22/11/1941
O4 6213   29/04/1944