Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 74 Today
» 1159 Yesterday
» 2308 Week
» 23210 Month
» 23210 Year
» 1244775 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #814
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6509   25/06/1932
O4 6209   28/07/1934
O4 6346   29/05/1937
O4 6357   03/11/1939
O4 6524   29/08/1942
O4 6219   10/03/1945
O4 3897   20/04/1947
O4 63688   17/12/1949