Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 1327 Today
» 1117 Yesterday
» 1327 Week
» 29907 Month
» 29907 Year
» 1251472 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3674
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15D
Firebox Type Round Top
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6586   24/08/1940
O4 6352   21/03/1942
O4 6209   22/07/1944
O4 3775   02/11/1946
O4 63770   22/10/1949