Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 531 Today
» 1251 Yesterday
» 4269 Week
» 1782 Month
» 229666 Year
» 1451231 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1323
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6210   21/07/1928
O4 6271   13/11/1930
O4 6258   18/03/1933
O4 6251   06/07/1935
O4 5375   04/09/1937
O4 6325   16/12/1939
O4 5022   13/06/1942