Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1081 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 8541 Week
» 6054 Month
» 233938 Year
» 1455503 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #821
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6366   05/11/1927
O4 6313   30/01/1932
O4 6628   05/05/1934
O4 6632   04/07/1936
O4 6212   02/08/1941