Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 162 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1196 Week
» 23702 Month
» 326892 Year
» 1548457 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1218
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1649   10/1918
O4 6313   07/02/1925
O4 6518   19/03/1932
O4 5380   26/05/1934
O4 6213   09/05/1936