Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1319 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 5279 Week
» 34865 Month
» 408878 Year
» 1630443 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1481
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1215   09/1912
O4 6311   09/10/1924
O4 6242   22/02/1930
O4 6308   14/10/1932
O4 6629   07/04/1935