Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 674 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 4273 Week
» 10407 Month
» 238291 Year
» 1459856 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1494
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1228   11/1912
O4 6268   09/08/1924
O4 6276   29/06/1929
O4 6215   28/03/1931
O4 6341   24/06/1933