Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 413 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7420 Week
» 13554 Month
» 241438 Year
» 1463003 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #946
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6274   23/08/1930
O4 6236   15/07/1933
O4 6215   30/11/1935
O4 6334   21/05/1938
O4 6259   08/06/1940
O4 6321   21/08/1943