Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 31 Online
» 713 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 4312 Week
» 10446 Month
» 238330 Year
» 1459895 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #927
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6333   20/09/1928
O4 6273   04/03/1933
O4 6224   27/07/1935
O4 6215   26/03/1938
O4 6314   14/09/1940
O4 6544   21/04/1945
O4 3904   31/01/1948