Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 517 Today
» 1251 Yesterday
» 4255 Week
» 1768 Month
» 229652 Year
» 1451217 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1267
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 5419   06/04/1935
O4 5417   20/02/1937
O4 6215   29/06/1940
O4 5397   27/02/1943