Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 467 Today
» 1251 Yesterday
» 4205 Week
» 1718 Month
» 229602 Year
» 1451167 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1245
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6342   15/12/1934
O4 6370   30/01/1937
O4 6260   29/07/1939
O4 5381   13/12/1941
O4 6375   17/06/1944
O4 3562   21/12/1946
O4 63629   19/11/1949