Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 153 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 5374 Week
» 20488 Month
» 323678 Year
» 1545243 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3279
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6329   27/03/1937
O4 6514   13/05/1939
O4 6582   19/07/1941
O4 6308   12/02/1944
O4 3759   26/07/1947
O4 63799   30/04/1949