Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 947 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1981 Week
» 24487 Month
» 327677 Year
» 1549242 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28289
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O1 63589   09/02/1951
O1 63803   24/10/1953
O1 63670   30/06/1956
O1 63725   27/09/1958
O1 63768   20/11/1962