Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 523 Today
» 1315 Yesterday
» 523 Week
» 30021 Month
» 366867 Year
» 1588432 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1275
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1925   06/1918
O4 6223   17/06/1933
O4 6319   30/11/1935
O4 6640   13/11/1937
O4 6307   28/09/1940
O4 6498   27/02/1943