Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 601 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1700 Week
» 7834 Month
» 235718 Year
» 1457283 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3676
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15D
Firebox Type Round Top
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6223   02/11/1940
O4 6621   31/07/1943
O4 3894   01/06/1946
O4 3848   14/11/1947
O4 63880   15/10/1949