Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 992 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 4591 Week
» 10725 Month
» 238609 Year
» 1460174 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1089
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1993   01/1919
O4 6527   17/03/1928
O4 6224   29/03/1930
O4 5271   08/10/1932
O4 6240   12/10/1935
O4 6566   24/12/1937