Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 644 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 4243 Week
» 10377 Month
» 238261 Year
» 1459826 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1381
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1680   06/1918
O4 5376   31/12/1927
O4 6532   31/05/1930
O4 6225   14/05/1932
O4 6347   24/11/1934
O4 5412   21/11/1936