Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 339 Today
» 1103 Yesterday
» 5976 Week
» 19080 Month
» 19080 Year
» 1240645 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1239
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6535   16/09/1933
O4 6264   15/07/1935
O4 5378   13/11/1937
O4 6257   09/11/1940
O4 6226   27/02/1943
O4 5419   06/10/1945
O4 3667   20/12/1947