Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 215 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4383 Week
» 19497 Month
» 322687 Year
» 1544252 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1493
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1227   11/1912
O4 6279   23/08/1924
O4 6541   12/11/1932
O4 6592   23/02/1935
O4 6560   07/08/1937