Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 171 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1205 Week
» 23711 Month
» 326901 Year
» 1548466 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28811
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O1 63817   12/05/1951
O4 63613   14/02/1953
O4 63575   13/03/1954
O1 63591   22/11/1956
O1 63589   12/12/1959