Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 102 Today
» 1086 Yesterday
» 102 Week
» 21004 Month
» 21004 Year
» 1242569 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3386
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6264   02/03/1940
O4 6503   25/07/1942
O4 6354   30/12/1944
O4 3753   01/11/1947
O4 3576   29/04/1950