Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 120 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 120 Week
» 6254 Month
» 234138 Year
» 1455703 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #861
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1839   12/1917
O4 6631   28/01/1931
O4 6373   03/06/1933
O4 6273   27/07/1935
O4 6353   24/09/1937
O4 6230   03/02/1940
O4 791   18/10/1941