Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 633 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 4232 Week
» 10366 Month
» 238250 Year
» 1459815 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1243
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1611   03/1918
O4 6231   19/03/1927
O4 6504   02/11/1929
O4 6627   29/08/1931
O4 6361   21/10/1933