Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 452 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 1791 Week
» 31289 Month
» 368135 Year
» 1589700 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1062
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6316   12/12/1931
O4 6231   31/03/1934
O4 6519   23/05/1936
O4 6498   13/08/1938
O4 6359   07/12/1940
O4 5377   10/07/1943