Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 163 Today
» 1348 Yesterday
» 163 Week
» 39209 Month
» 413222 Year
» 1634787 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1212
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1621   07/1918
O4 6501   30/07/1932
O4 6305   25/08/1934
O4 6347   31/10/1936
O4 6365   14/01/1939
O4 6231   27/07/1940
O4 6538   02/10/1943