Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 160 Today
» 1348 Yesterday
» 160 Week
» 39206 Month
» 413219 Year
» 1634784 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28257
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O1 63652   16/09/1950
O1 63578   14/02/1953
O1 63689   07/04/1955
O1 63792   31/08/1957