Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 402 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7409 Week
» 13543 Month
» 241427 Year
» 1462992 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28387
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O1 63872   20/12/1952
O1 63578   04/02/1955
O4 63754   24/08/1957
O4 63734   01/03/1961