Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 908 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14314 Week
» 67330 Month
» 186857 Year
» 3213710 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #1165
Pre Grouping Company |
GCR |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
15 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
O4 |
6361 |
|
10/05/1924 |
O4 |
6240 |
|
12/05/1928 |
O4 |
6233 |
|
11/10/1930 |
O4 |
6244 |
|
07/01/1933 |
O4 |
6233 |
|
13/04/1935 |
|