Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 83 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1117 Week
» 23623 Month
» 326813 Year
» 1548378 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3311
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6238   25/12/1937
O4 6358   25/11/1939
O4 6347   09/05/1942
O4 6245   18/09/1943
O4 3674   23/11/1946
O4 63681   11/05/1948
O4 63581   31/12/1949