Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 341 Today
» 1103 Yesterday
» 5978 Week
» 19082 Month
» 19082 Year
» 1240647 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3222
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6555   07/12/1935
O4 6236   19/02/1938
O4 6502   14/09/1940
O4 6634   20/11/1943
O4 3756   08/06/1946
O4 63685   19/02/1949