Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1061 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 6282 Week
» 21396 Month
» 324586 Year
» 1546151 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1336
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1632   10/1918
O4 6282   07/02/1925
O4 6261   10/05/1930
O4 6262   25/06/1932
O4 6237   18/05/1935