Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 101 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 101 Week
» 6235 Month
» 234119 Year
» 1455684 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1414
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 2157   06/1919
O4 6527   01/02/1930
O4 6337   09/07/1932
O4 5391   06/10/1934
O4 6348   31/07/1937
O4 6237   09/12/1939
O4 6639   22/08/1942