Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 152 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1186 Week
» 23692 Month
» 326882 Year
» 1548447 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28391
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O1 63817   23/01/1953
O1 63589   05/02/1955
O1 63806   23/03/1957
O4 63706   27/07/1962