Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 693 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 4292 Week
» 10426 Month
» 238310 Year
» 1459875 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1102
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6304   03/06/1932
O4 6243   29/06/1935
O4 6328   16/10/1937
O4 5415   11/01/1941
O4 6350   13/03/1943